Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/16/2021 5:40:50 AM
Friday, February 26, 2021
House
Created: 2/24/2021 10:00 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Charkoudian

Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment - Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
Del Stein

Public Safety – Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards – Adoption
Del Henson

Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Del Boyce

Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Del Shetty

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting
Dels Love and Henson

Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Del Mautz

Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
The Spkr (Admin)

Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Del Terrasa

Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Del Healey

Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Del Healey

Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement

Created: 2/7/2021 1:36 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation

Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting - Prince George's County PG 402-21
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Carey

Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Del Chisholm

Environment – State Wetlands – Piers and Other Improvements
Del Hill

Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Bridges

Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Henson

Workgroup on Public Water Access
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:41 AM)
Del Hartman

Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
(Removed - 2/17/2021 1:54 PM)

Click to return on the top page