Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/14/2021 7:27:01 AM
Friday, February 26, 2021
Senate
Created: 2/22/2021 11:58 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sen Hettleman

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sen Hettleman

Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability
Sen Carter

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification

Created: 1/27/2021 10:06 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
Thursday, February 18, 2021 11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc), et al

Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sen Guzzone

Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
Sen King

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sens Zucker and Kelley

State Child Welfare System - Reporting
(Added - 2/1/2021 4:42 PM)
Sen Sydnor

Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
Sen Reilly

Landlord and Tenant - Establishment of Rent Escrow Accounts - Time Limit
(Removed - 2/9/2021 1:44 PM)
Sen Bailey

Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
(Removed - 2/17/2021 10:55 AM)
Sen Hettleman

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
Sen Hettleman

Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
Carroll County Senators

Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)
Sen Carter

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
(Removed - 2/22/2021 11:57 AM)

Click to return on the top page