Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/19/2021 8:23:15 AM
Friday, February 26, 2021
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 2/22/2021 4:55 PM
8:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore City
Created: 2/18/2021 8:11 AM
8:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Local Bill Hearings and Voting Session
Special Guest: U.S. Senator Ben Cardin
(Added - 2/25/2021 11:36 AM)

Baltimore County
Created: 2/23/2021 6:02 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Baltimore County Executive
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB1094
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Voting Session: HB45, HB1141
(Added - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Local Bill Hearing: HB895, HB913, HB1094, HB1197
(Removed - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)
Voting Session
(Removed - 2/25/2021 12:30 PM)

Charles
Created: 2/23/2021 3:56 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Updates

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/14/2021 10:52 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 2/15/2021 10:00 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Created: 2/19/2021 9:41 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Southern Maryland
Created: 2/22/2021 9:36 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page