Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/6/2020 8:52:12 AM
Monday, March 2, 2020
Senate
Created: 2/21/2020 2:03 PM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Public School Construction
Capital Community College Facilities Grant Program
Capital Maryland Environmental Service
Capital Department of Juvenile Services
Capital Department of State Police

House
Created: 2/19/2020 4:16 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 2/19/2020 4:16 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 2/3/2020 12:13 PM)
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights
(Removed - 2/3/2020 12:13 PM)

Canceled
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
State Board of Elections
State Treasurer
Department of Information Technology
MEMSOF

Created: 2/10/2020 3:27 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Prohibition - Exceptions PG 305-20
(Added - 2/20/2020 4:10 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
(Added - 2/20/2020 4:10 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Shopping Center License PG 303-20
(Added - 2/20/2020 4:10 PM)
Del J. Lewis, et al

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Carillon Development
(Added - 2/24/2020 6:58 PM)
Del T. Branch

Business Regulation - Security Systems - Battery-Charged Fences
Del Wilson

Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts
Dels Mautz and Sample-Hughes

Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company
Del Howard, et al

Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
(Removed - 3/2/2020 10:28 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 308-20
(Removed - 3/2/2020 10:38 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit PG 304-20
(Removed - 3/2/2020 10:38 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 314-20
(Removed - 3/2/2020 10:38 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20
(Removed - 3/2/2020 10:38 AM)

Created: 2/14/2020 8:43 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Cox

Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Program - Revisions
Del Hill, et al

Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project Study
Del R. Lewis, et al

Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Dels Lisanti and Johnson

Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities – Closing or Partial Closing – Public Notice
Del Kipke

Health Facilities - Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Administration of Anesthesia
Del Miller, et al

Task Force to Study Privatization of the University of Maryland Medical System
Del R. Lewis

Hospitals - Care of Infants After Discharge
Del Johnson, et al

Hospitals – Discharge or Transfer of Patients – Prior Authorization of Prescriptions (The Mae Abraham Act)
Del Johnson

Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact
Del Barron, et al

Hospitals - Community Benefits
Dels Lisanti and Johnson

University of Maryland – Harford Memorial Hospital Closure – Economic Impact Study
Del Morgan

Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services
(Removed - 2/27/2020 2:09 PM)
Del Rosenberg

Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing
(Removed - 2/28/2020 2:39 PM)

Created: 2/10/2020 11:53 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
The hearing on March 2nd has been moved to the Joint Hearing Room in the Dept. of Legislative Services Building (90 State Circle, 1st floor). House Bill 1522 has been withdrawn.
Del Reznik, et al

Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Del Wilkins, et al

Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status
Del Buckel, et al

Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act)
Del Wilkins, et al

Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Del Malone, et al

Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Del Malone, et al

Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Del Malone, et al

Legislative Districts - Standards
Del McKay, et al

United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Del Wilkins, et al

Participation by Maryland Residents in the 2020 Census
Del Acevero, et al

United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Del Ruth, et al

United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Democracy Amendment
Del M. Fisher, et al

United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Curative Bill
(Added - 2/20/2020 12:42 PM)
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Corrective Bill
(Added - 2/20/2020 12:42 PM)
Del K. Young, et al

General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
(Removed - 2/28/2020 3:19 PM)

Created: 2/25/2020 10:03 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Dels Charkoudian and Palakovich Carr

Sales and Use Tax - Services
Del Luedtke, et al

Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 2/26/2020 11:04 AM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Prince Georges County Government Office, 1801 McCormick Drive, Conference Room 140, Largo, MD
Prince George's County Regional Listening Sessions

Created: 2/26/2020 11:07 AM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - Prince Georges County Government Office, 1801 McCormick Drive, Conference Room 140, Largo, MD
Prince George's County Regional Listening Sessions.