Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2021 11:37:52 AM
Wednesday, April 7, 2021
House
Created: 4/7/2021 11:51 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del McIntosh

Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Hayes, et al

Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Chr EHE (Dept)

Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Rosapepe

State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Washington

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Griffith, et al

Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Sydnor

Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Augustine

Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 4/5/2021 5:40 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 353, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Added - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Removed - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)

Created: 4/7/2021 5:29 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
5:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page