Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/13/2021 1:57:19 PM
Thursday, April 8, 2021
House
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 4/6/2021 8:22 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
Wednesday, April 7, 2021 1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- SB 67, SB 299, SB 565, SB 777 and SB 796
(Added - 4/7/2021 5:55 PM)
- SB 67, SB 299, SB 777
(Removed - 4/7/2021 5:55 PM)

Click to return on the top page