Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/31/2020 12:15:21 AM
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 12/30/2019 2:26 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
This meeting is being conducted via webinar. Click here to view.
General Meeting

Digital Learning Stakeholders Committee
Created: 1/3/2020 9:20 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Department of Information Technology, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD 21033
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Conference Call
Monthly Meeting
Web Meeting Call In #: 1-855-797-9480 US Toll Free
(Added - 4/20/2020 2:43 PM)
Access Code: 619-935-167
(Added - 4/20/2020 2:43 PM)

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 4/15/2020 10:51 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting

Natalie M. Laprade Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission
Canceled
2:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
Votes on Licensure
Executive Director's Report
Update on Commission programs, legislative affairs, and regulations.
Committee and Staff Reports