Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/11/2020 9:47:03 AM
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
Senate
Created: 5/4/2020 5:46 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Virtual Briefing: Update from Maryland Insurance Administration on COVID-19 Related Matters
Briefing on Banks and COVID-19 Related Impact Payments and Small Business Loans
(Immediately following Update from MIA)
(Added - 5/5/2020 11:28 AM)

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Digital Learning Stakeholders Committee
Created: 1/3/2020 9:21 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Department of Information Technology, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD 21033
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Conference Call
Call in #: 1-855-797-9480 (toll free)
(Added - 5/15/2020 12:29 PM)
Access Code: 612 879 464
(Added - 5/15/2020 12:29 PM)
Monthly Meeting
Access Code: 619 935 167
(Removed - 5/15/2020 12:29 PM)
Call in #: 1-855-797-9480
(Removed - 5/15/2020 12:29 PM)

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Canceled
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Office of Health Care Quality, Potomac Room, 2nd Floor, 7120 Samuel Morse Dr., Columbia, MD
General Meeting of the Committee.