Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/29/2020 7:37:50 AM
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 5/11/2020 11:15 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland Department of Transportation on TTF Revenue Attainment

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 12/30/2019 2:28 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
This meeting is being conducted via webinar. Click here to view
General Meeting

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 5/18/2020 4:20 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting