Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 1:14:47 PM
Thursday, May 21, 2020
Senate
Created: 5/14/2020 11:02 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the Status of the Maryland Economy and Operating Budget

House
Created: 5/8/2020 12:51 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
2:15 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefings by the Department of Legislative Services and the Department of Budget and Management
(Added - 5/21/2020 10:46 AM)
Briefing by the Department of Budget and Management
(Removed - 5/21/2020 10:46 AM)

Other
No hearings scheduled for today