Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/8/2020 3:59:42 AM
Tuesday, June 9, 2020
Senate
Created: 6/1/2020 11:47 AM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Availability and Suitability of PPE for Frontline State Employees - Joint with House Appropriations Committee

House
Created: 6/2/2020 12:45 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Availability and Suitability of PPE for Frontline State Employees - Joint with Senate Finance Committee

Created: 5/14/2020 11:33 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
- Maryland Insurance Administration (MIA): Introduction of new Insurance Commissioner; briefing on rates, prior authorization, and telehealth.
- Health Services Cost Review Commission (HSCRC) and Maryland Hospital Association (MHA): Briefing on COVID-19 impacts on hospitals.

Other
Digital Learning Stakeholders Committee
Created: 5/1/2020 2:56 PM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Department of Information Technology, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD 21033
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Conference Call
Call in Number: 1-855-797-9480 U.S. Toll Free
(Added - 6/5/2020 10:44 AM)
Access Code: 161 187 1552
(Added - 6/5/2020 10:44 AM)
Monthly Meeting