Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/5/2020 4:29:37 AM
Thursday, June 11, 2020
Senate
Created: 5/21/2020 3:29 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Covid 19 Impact on Assisted Living Programs and CCRCs.
Designated members of House Health and Governmental Operations and Senate Budget and Taxation’s Health and Human Services Subcommittee have been invited to participate.

House
Created: 6/2/2020 12:45 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Education Issues Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic - Joint with the House Ways and Means Committee
(Added - 6/2/2020 1:05 PM)
Briefing on Education Issues Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic
(Removed - 6/2/2020 1:05 PM)

Created: 6/2/2020 3:24 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 4/3/2020 1:39 PM
Thursday, May 14, 2020 9:00 AM - Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
Monthly Meeting