Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/8/2020 4:10:50 AM
Monday, June 22, 2020
Senate
Created: 6/15/2020 12:13 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the State Department of Education and the Maryland Family Network on the impact of COVID-19 on Childcare

House
Created: 6/16/2020 9:52 AM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting

Created: 6/17/2020 12:51 PM
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the State Department of Education and the Maryland Family Network on the Impact of COVID-19 on Child Care

Other
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Created: 6/12/2020 1:00 PM
2:00 PM - Conference Call
Call-in-Number: 520-800-2640
PIN: 590 920 789
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board Meeting