Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 9/17/2021 3:50:21 PM
Thursday, August 12, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Created: 8/5/2021 9:08 AM
10:30 AM - Google Meet Video Conference
10:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 873 0164 0287
Passcode: 5YiwJj
One Tap Mobile: +1 301-715-8592..87301640287#....*775634# US (Washington, D.C.)
+1 929-436-2866..87301640287#....*775634# US (new York)
First Meeting

Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
Created: 8/3/2021 3:11 PM
1:30 PM - Maryland Stadium Authority, The Warehouse at Camden Yards, 333 West Camden Street, Suite 500, Baltimore, MD
Quarterly Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 7/12/2021 1:52 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and then click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Additional meeting material will be available at https://mdschoolconstruction.org
Public video conference to discuss regular normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page