Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 4:19:15 AM
Wednesday, September 2, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/14/2020 1:06 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Department of Commerce on Pandemic Assistance Programs

Created: 8/13/2020 11:25 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 8/17/2020 3:09 PM
10:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of topics related to higher education.

Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 8/27/2020 10:19 AM
12:00 PM - Location-TBD
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Continued Review of Maryland Environmental Service Personnel and Board Practices.

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 6/18/2020 11:34 AM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
8:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
To join the Zoom meeting click here
Meeting of Full Authority+Hearings
Zoom Meeting ID: 916 6805 8063
(Added - 8/26/2020 10:42 AM)
Passcode: 818215
(Added - 8/26/2020 10:42 AM)
To call in: +1 301 751 8592 (Germantown)
(Added - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
To find your local number go to: https://zoom.us/u/abFPWWGyx4
(Added - 8/26/2020 10:42 AM)
+1 253 215 8782 US (Tacoma)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+1 301 715 8592 US (Germantown)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+1 346 248 7799 US Houston
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+13017158592,,91668058063#,,,,,,0#,,818215#US (Germantown)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
+19292056099,,91668058063#,,,,,,0#,,818215#US (New York)
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
Dial by your location:
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
Meeting ID: 916 6805 8063
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)
One tap mobile:
(Removed - 8/26/2020 11:06 AM)