Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/25/2020 11:09:15 AM
Thursday, September 10, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/4/2020 9:54 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Work Session
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 8/20/2020 2:01 PM
Briefing
10:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
Briefings on Local Management Board Activities and Services.

Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Created: 9/4/2020 4:04 PM
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM - Location-TBD

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 8/13/2020 2:12 PM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To view the meeting click on Livestream and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the approrpiate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.