Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2020 12:50:29 PM
Thursday, October 8, 2020
Senate
Created: 10/1/2020 11:26 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
12:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Revenue Update by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 9/23/2020 4:11 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Public Hearing on the Maryland School for the Deaf
Joint with the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education Subcommittee
(Added - 10/1/2020 11:26 AM)

Created: 10/1/2020 12:42 PM
Education Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Public Hearing on the Maryland School for the Deaf
Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
(Added - 10/1/2020 12:44 PM)

House
Created: 8/4/2020 9:57 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Work Session
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting

Created: 9/22/2020 2:43 PM
Local Revenues Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Created: 9/21/2020 4:46 PM
1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Webinar link will be posted on the Treasurer's website
Legislative review, revenue estimates, and the review of capital programs

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 9/18/2020 11:47 AM
10:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
Briefings on long-term care issues for families.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 9/23/2020 7:37 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
9:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 10/1/2020 8:50 AM)

Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Created: 9/4/2020 4:06 PM
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM - Location-TBD
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM - On-Line Meeting

Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Created: 10/1/2020 4:29 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Recommendations continued.
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation)
A link to view the meeting will be made available to the public in advance of the hearing.
(Removed - 10/6/2020 11:02 AM)