Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2020 2:19:18 PM
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 9/4/2020 2:50 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Update on the State Economic Programs (TEDCO, MARBIDCO, MSBDFA, MEDAAF)

Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Created: 10/5/2020 4:45 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Please see the Commission webpage for the agenda and meeting updates.
Meeting Video
The meeeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will provided to the public before the hearing begins.
(Removed - 10/6/2020 1:06 PM)