Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2020 2:36:57 PM
Thursday, October 15, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/6/2020 3:19 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
10:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Joint Subcommittee Briefing: The Health Occupations and Long Term Care Subcommittee and Health Insurance Subcommittee on telehealth

Other
Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Created: 10/9/2020 11:38 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Final Recommendations.
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link to view the meeting will be made available to the public in advance of the hearing.
(Removed - 10/13/2020 2:43 PM)

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 9/21/2020 10:39 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.