Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2020 4:23:52 AM
Thursday, November 12, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 11/5/2020 9:22 AM
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
- Impacts of COVID-19 on Hospice Care in Maryland
- Follow-up from HGO Committee Briefing (8/26) on COVID-19's Impact on Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities in Maryland

Other
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/28/2020 4:23 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A livestream link to YouTube for the public will be provided prior to the start of the meeting.

Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 10/14/2020 7:29 AM
2:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Board Requested Legislation
2020 Actuarial Valuation and 2022 Contribution Rates

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 11/6/2020 12:25 PM
10:00 AM - Conference Call
Dial-In Number: 1-617-675-4444
Participant Passcode: 912 029 186 1120#
FY2021 Call for Proposals Information Call
The Maryland Community Health Resources Commission is hosting an informational call for potential applicants on Thursday, November 12, 2020.
It is not necessary to RSVP regarding attendance in advance of the call.
Participation is encouraged, but not mandatory.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 10/13/2020 3:15 PM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.