Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2020 4:23:02 AM
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Created: 9/23/2020 11:11 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
To join by video click here
Regularly Scheduled Meeting
To join by phone: +1 585 969 5071
PIN: 309 089 740#

Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:17 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 11/13/2020 11:21 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting

Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space/Agricultural Land Preservation
Created: 10/13/2020 3:01 PM
Briefing
2:30 PM - On-Line Meeting
Briefing by relevant State agencies on issues related to land conservation, including the impact of the Covid-19 pandemic on Program Open Space, agricultural land preservation, and State Park operations.

Maryland Insurance Administration
Created: 10/23/2020 12:58 PM
12:00 PM to 3:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Call in Phone#: 415-655-0001
Code: 172 754 3386
Web Link
For more information click here
Public hearing on specific rate increase requests from certain long-term care insurance carriers in Maryland: MedAmerica Insurance Company and Genworth Life Insurance.
The hearing is for the insurance company officials to explain their reasons for rate increases.

Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland, Commission to Advance
Created: 11/16/2020 1:42 PM
11:00 AM to 3:00 PM - On-Line Meeting