Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 2:47:11 AM
Created: 11/5/2020 2:31 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 11/10/2020 5:01 PM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 11/18/2020 1:23 PM)
Created: 11/23/2020 12:09 PM
2:00 PM - Conference Call
Dial-In Number: 1-617-675-4444
Participant Passcode: 176 978 569 2203#
Participant Passcode: 176 978 569 2203#
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission.
Update on FY2021 Call for Proposals.
Created: 11/20/2020 1:09 PM
1:00 PM - Conference Call
Call-In Number: (US) 1-316-536-0499
PIN: 865 136 975#
PIN: 865 136 975#
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting