Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/21/2021 8:03:45 AM
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Acevero

OIS - Testing

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 11/12/2020 11:54 AM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Briefing
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting
The Future of Transportation in Maryland

Other
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 12/10/2020 7:57 AM
Work Session
10:00 AM - On-Line Meeting

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 8/28/2020 9:05 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Decision Meeting.