Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/21/2021 7:20:23 AM
Friday, December 18, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 12/14/2020 1:37 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Mental Health and Law Enforcement
- Briefing on Mental Health of Law Enforcement Officers
(Added - 12/17/2020 3:25 PM)
- Briefing from Local Crisis Response Teams on Community Intervention Strategies
(Added - 12/17/2020 3:25 PM)
- Feedback from Behavioral Health Professionals, Providers, and Community Advocates
(Added - 12/17/2020 3:25 PM)

Other
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study
Created: 12/4/2020 12:55 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Briefing
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A livestream link to YouTube for the public will be provided prior to the start of the meeting.
(Removed - 12/11/2020 11:27 AM)