Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke

District
31B
County
Anne Arundel
Committee Assignment(s)
Annapolis Info
212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421
Toll-free in MD
Fax 410-841-3553 | 301-858-3553
Interim Info
212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421
Contact
nicholaus.kipke@house.state.md.us
Party
Republican
Tenure
First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2006. Member of the House January 10, 2007 to January 14 2015, representing District 31, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 31B, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments
2013- Minority Leader
2014 House Committee on Rules and Executive Nominations
2007- Health and Government Operations Committee
2007- Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2015 Estates and Trusts Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2013- Spending Affordability Committee
Past House Service
Chair, Anne Arundel County House Delegation, 2013; Joint Committee on Base Realignment and Closure, 2011-2012; Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2007-2011; Government Operations Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2011-2014; Joint Committee on Federal Relations, 2010-2015; Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer, 2015.
Public Service
Maryland Health Care Reform Coordinating Council, 2011-; Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Commission, 2010-2011; Maryland Council for New Americans, 2009-2010; Workgroup on Clean and Healthy Waterways, Anne Arundel County Delegation, 2009-2010; Statewide Empowerment Zones for Seniors Commission, 2008-2009; Chair, Workgroup on Correctional Facilities Residential Drug Treatment, 2008-2009; Drug and Alcohol Abuse Council, Anne Arundel County, 2005-2007; Community Liaison for County Council member Ronald C. Dillon, Anne Arundel County, 2002-2006.
Memberships
Autism Awareness Advocate, 2003-2012; Volunteer, Habitat for Humanity, 2005-2008; Vice Chair, Maryland Interfaith Recover Coalition, 2005-2006; Chesapeake Bay Foundation; Coastal Conservation Association; Maryland Farm Bureau; Boulevard Park Improvement Association; North County Republican Club; Life Member, National Rifle Association.
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, January 26, 1979; Chesapeake High School; Anne Arundel Community College; Restaurant Manager, FriendCo Restaurants, 1995-2000; Manufacturer Representative, REPS & Associates, Inc., 2000-; Chair, Church Council, Our Lady of the Chesapeake Catholic Church, 2001-02; Married, one child..
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM