Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Delegate Warren E. Miller

District
9A
County
Howard and Carroll
Committee Assignment(s)
Annapolis Info
403 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3582 | 301-858-3582
Toll-free in MD
Fax 410-841-3571 | 301-858-3571
Interim Info
403 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3582 | 301-858-3582
Contact
warren.miller@house.state.md.us
Party
Republican
Tenure
Appointed to the House of Delegates on March 7, 2003. Member of the House since march 10, 2003, representing District 9A, Howard County, 2003-2015; District 9A Carroll and Howard Counties since January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments
2003- Economic Matters Committee
2003- Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003- Property and Casualty Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011- Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2015 Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2015 House Committee on Rules & Executive Nominations
2015 Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
2015 Joint Committee on Legislative Information Technology and Open Government
Past House Service
Task Force to Study Economic Development and Apprenticeships, 2012-2014; Consumer Protection and Commercial Law Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee, 2007-2010; Banking, Economic Development, Science, and Technology Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee, 2003-2010; Joint Advisory Committee on Legislative Data Systems, 2007-2014; Deathcare Industry Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee, 2003-2006.
Public Service
Task Force to Study Economic Development and Apprenticeships, 2013-; Commission to Study the Title Insurance Industry in Maryland, 2008-2010; Redistricting Commission, Howard County, 2001.
Memberships
Pro-Life Caucus, 2011-; Chair, Maryland Taxpayer Protection Caucus, 2007-; Maryland Veterans Caucus, 2006-; Howard County Republican Central Committee, 1998-2003.
Awards
John Shaw Award, Maryland Business for Responsive Government , 2010; Legislator of the Year Award, Maryland Retailers Association , 2010; Outstanding Legislator of the Year, Maryland Business for Responsive Government , 2008; Significant Achievement Award, Maryland Taxpayers Association , 2006.
Biographical Information
Born, Riverdale, Maryland, October 5, 1964 ; Glenelg High School, Glenelg, Maryland, 1983 ; Towson State University, B.S., Business Administration, 1988 ; Stockbroker, J. W. Grant & Associates, Columbia, 1987-88 ; Field Representative, Dole for President, 1987-88 ; Deputy Director, Computer Center, White House Office of Presidential Personnel, 1988-90 ; Confidential Assistant to Assistant Administrator, Agency for International Development, Office of the Administrator, 1990-91 ; Special Assistant to White House Liaison, Office of Administrator, Agency for International Development, 1991-92 ; White House Liaison, U.S. Office of Personnel Management, 1992-93 ; Technical Recruiter, Manpower, Washington, D.C., 1993 ; Campaign Manager, Bartlett for Congress, 1994 ; Programmer/Analyst, Advanced Technology Systems, McLean, 1995-96 ; Management and Technology Consultant, Booz, Allen & Hamilton, 1996-2005 ; Business Development Manager, Human Touch LLC, 2006-09 ; Director, Healthcare , TKC Global, 2009- ; Married, Two children .
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM