Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Delegate Meagan C. Simonaire

District
31B
County
Anne Arundel
Committee Assignment(s)
Annapolis Info
156 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3206 | 301-858-3206
Toll-free in MD
Interim Info
156 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3206 | 301-858-3206
Contact
Meagan.Simonaire@house.state.md.us
Party
Republican
Tenure
First elected to the House of Delegates in November, 2014. Appointed December 19, 2014.Sworn in December 29, 2014 to replace Steven R. Schuh who resigned November 30, 2014. Member of the House since 2014.
Current Assignments
2015 Ways and Means Committee
2015 Revenues Subcommittee of the Ways and Means Committee
2015 Finance Resources Subcommittee of the Ways and Means Committee
2015 Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
2015 Women Legislators of Maryland
Public Service
Human Trafficking Conference, Participant.
Memberships
Chesapeake Bay Foundation; Maryland Taxpayers Association; National Rifle Association; Maryland Right to Life; Anne Arundel NCRC.
Biographical Information
Born, August 18, 1990; Bob Jones University, Greenville, South Carolina; Cosmetologist; Single.
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM