Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock
Sponsored by
Delegates Hubbard and Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from specified regulation the distribution of raw milk and raw milk products from milk producers directly to the final consumer if the consumer has acquired a specified ownership interest in specified animals; requiring the consumer and the milk producer to enter into a written contract of agistment relating to a specified ownership interest; establishing that the exemption does not apply to specified sales of milk and milk products; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/07/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-403, 21-434 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM