Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lafferty, and Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include the State as a member of the U.S. Climate Alliance on or before July 1, 2018; prohibiting the Governor from withdrawing the State from the U.S. Climate Alliance unless the General Assembly enacts a law approving the withdrawal; and requiring the Governor to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 each year, beginning on or before December 1, 2018, on any collaborations among Alliance members and any policies or programs that the Alliance has endorsed or undertaken.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0138
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/06/2017
Legislative Date
6/06/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {630211/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-33)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/06/2017 6/06/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {630211/1 Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-33) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text - Chapter - Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM