Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "AWOL machine" to include a Vaportini or any similar device, so as to prohibit a Vaportini or any similar device from being used to inhale alcohol vapor or otherwise introduce alcohol in any form into the human body.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1416 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/10/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (105-28) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM