Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, as a condition of a defendant's pretrial release on a charge of violating a protective order or if the court suspends the sentence of a defendant convicted of failing to comply with relief granted in an interim protective order, a temporary protective order, or a final protective order, to order that the defendant be supervised by active electronic monitoring; requiring a defendant to pay monitoring fees; and authorizing the court to exempt the defendant from the fees under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0977
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/27/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/27/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 6-221 )
(   4-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM