Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle and Clagett
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, and expenses of the Board members; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified persons from providing services under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0576 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/19/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/19/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9, 2-108 )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM