Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Anderson, Cardin, Conaway, Corderman, Cox, D.M. Davis, J. Lewis, Lopez, McComas, Moon, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, pending a determination by a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child whether to transfer its jurisdiction to the juvenile court, provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning the child from the time of the child's arrest until a certain event occurs; establishing that, if a case is transferred to the juvenile court, certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records continue to apply; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0452
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0555 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/19/2018
Legislative Date
11/19/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Photos and Videos
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-19)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378677/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Bartlett)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/19/2018 11/19/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Photos and Videos
House 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {532411/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (122-19) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {378677/1 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {378677/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Bartlett) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM