Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsored by
Delegate Arora
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully shine, point, or focus the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating an aircraft; exempting specified individuals under specified circumstances from provisions of the Act; specifying a penalty; and specifying that a sentence imposed under the Act is in addition to a specified other sentence.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0019
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {978378/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/04/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 26
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {978378/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM