Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, A. Washington, and Tarlau
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $125,000 in the State budget, in fiscal years 2020 through 2024, for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a near completer communication campaign; requiring the Commission to develop a web-based match program for near completers to facilitate the matching of a near completer with a certain institution; establishing a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program to provide tuition assistance for students to attend a community college in the State; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2017
Legislative Date
10/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2018
Legislative Date
1/09/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {985264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {383920/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984432/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-48)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2017 10/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
House 1/09/2018 1/09/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {985264/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {383920/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {984432/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-48) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209, 16-317, 16-514, 18-3401 through 18-3407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM