Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation Subgoals - Prime Contractors
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring, under specified circumstances, a unit of State government to count the dollar value of a procurement contract made directly or indirectly with a prime contractor that is a certified minority business enterprise toward meeting the certified minority business enterprise participation subgoal on the contract.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM