Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Law - Waiver From Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a public body to request a waiver from the provisions of the prevailing wage law for construction of an elementary or a secondary school if compliance with the law defers or cancels the construction of another school, or increases the cost of constructing a school by 10% or more; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to grant a waiver within 90 days after specified conditions have been satisfied by a public body; and requiring the Commissioner to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/28/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM