Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Hettleman, Korman, Moon, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to provide prescription monitoring data to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration for further investigation; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0195
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0088 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2018 9/11/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {866983/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {367970/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM