Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program - Former Subcontractors Transitioning to Prime Contractors
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations under the minority business enterprise program that recognize and give credit to former subcontractors that submit bids as prime contractors on specified procurement contracts.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page