Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "smoking" for purposes of the Clean Indoor Air Act to include the use of an electronic smoking device; defining "electronic smoking device" as an electronic device that can be used to deliver nicotine or other substances to the individual inhaling from the device; including in the definition of "electronic smoking device" an electronic cigarette, cigar, cigarillo, or pipe; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1291 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/19/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/19/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-501 through 24-503, 24-504, 24-507, 24-508, 24-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM