Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and Parole
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an inmate who is serving a sentence in a State or local correctional facility for committing specified child pornography offenses from earning diminution credits to reduce the inmate's term of confinement, being released on parole in order to undergo specified treatment, being eligible for parole consideration, or receiving specified deductions from the inmate's term of confinement.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/03/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 7/03/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-502, 3-702, 7-301 )
(   11-207, 11-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM