Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga and Arikan
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased solely for use in a qualified opportunity zone in Baltimore County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide a vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/29/2019
Legislative Date
7/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/29/2019 7/29/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM