Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that at least one school resource officer be assigned to each public school in the State; requiring specified public schools to hire retired law enforcement officers as school resource officers for the school; requiring specified school resource officers to obtain a special police officer commission issued by the Department of State Police; requiring the county superintendent to submit an application to the Secretary of State Police for a special police commission for each school resource officer hired; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0020 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/06/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/06/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2015 1/16/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 26-102, 7-1701 through 7-1705, 7-437 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM