Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0028


CH0610

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain individuals to satisfy the requirement to possess and display a driver's license while driving a motor vehicle by carrying and displaying a certain recall notice issued under the Act within the previous 60 days; requiring a law enforcement officer who confiscates an individual's driver's license for certain reasons to provide the holder of the license with a certain recall notice; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop the form for the recall notice and provide the form to law enforcement agencies.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0173
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/29/2019
Legislative Date
7/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/29/2019 7/29/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Failure to Possess or Display
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Issuance and Display of Recall Notice
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:32 PM