Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Participants in Youth Sports Programs - Concussions - Penalties for Coaches
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to establish specified penalties for a violation of specified provisions of law relating to concussions and head injuries; requiring a local board of education to suspend a coach who violates specified provisions of law relating to the removal from play of a student who is suspected of sustaining a concussion or other head injury in a practice or game and the return to play of the student; providing the opportunity for a coach to appeal the decision of the county board to the State Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/26/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/26/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-433 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM