Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Fourth-Degree Sex Offense - School Employees and Contractors
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora and Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "person in a position of authority" relating to prohibiting an individual from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances to remove a limitation to full-time employees and to include specified contractors or persons employed by or under contract with contractors.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0377
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
8/01/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 8/01/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM