Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a store from distributing plastic disposable carryout bags free of charge to a customer at the point of sale; requiring a store to charge and collect a 10-cent fee for each paper disposable carryout bag the store provides; authorizing the store to pay a customer a credit of at least 5 cents for each bag provided by the customer; requiring a store to remit to the Comptroller the money retained by the store for specified purposes; establishing a maximum penalty of $100 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0057
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0551 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/09/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM