Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "firearm telematics" as an electronic sensor or equipment installed on a firearm for purposes of tracking the location of the firearm if it becomes lost or stolen; requiring the Handgun Roster Board under the Department of State Police to study and make recommendations about firearm telematics; requiring the Handgun Roster Board to take certain actions in conducting the study and making recommendations; and requiring the Handgun Roster Board to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2019
Legislative Date
9/10/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {902411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-39)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2019 9/10/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {902411/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 46
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47B
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (92-39) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:06 PM