Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to require retirees who are under normal retirement age and are receiving a disability retirement allowance to undergo a medical examination if good cause exists; authorizing the Board of Trustees to suspend a disability retirement allowance if the Board finds that a disability retiree is no longer mentally or physically incapacitated for the further performance of the normal duties of the position of the retiree at the time of retirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/07/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/07/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   29-115.1, 29-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM