Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of education to establish an anonymous two-way text messaging tip program to allow the reporting of an act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation of a student; requiring each board to publicize the two-way text messaging tip program in specified locations; requiring the completion of a victim of bullying, harassment, or intimidation report form and the provision of a specified transcript to a specified person on receipt of a report of any act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0853 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/01/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/01/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-424, 7-424.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM